Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Léon-Alexander Lejeune, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Prefect of Lower Niger {Niger Inferiore}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Mar 1860BornTournais-sur Dives, France
188423.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
23 May 190040.2AppointedPrefect of Lower Niger {Niger Inferiore}, Nigeria
5 Sep 190545.4DiedPrefect of Lower Niger {Niger Inferiore}, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Léon-Alexander Lejeune:
Priest Léon-Alexander Lejeune C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Prefect of Lower Niger {Niger Inferiore}

  • a priest for 21.7 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013