Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Balthasar Brungardt

Bishop of Dodge City, Kansas, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jul 1958 Born
23 May 199839.8Ordained PriestPriest of Wichita, Kansas, USA
15 Dec 201052.4AppointedBishop of Dodge City, Kansas, USA
2 Feb 201152.5Ordained BishopBishop of Dodge City, Kansas, USA

MicroData Summary for John Balthasar Brungardt
Bishop John Balthasar Brungardt (born ) Bishop of Dodge City

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSalina, KS, Diocese of Salina, Kansas
Ordained BishopOur Lady of Guadalupe, Cathedral, Dodge City, Diocese of Dodge City, Kansas

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Dodge City.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Dec 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,940
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 2,011, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast