Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ronald Michael Gilmore

Bishop Emeritus of Dodge City, Kansas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Apr 1942 BornPittsburg, KS
7 Jun 196927.1Ordained PriestPriest of Wichita, Kansas, USA
12 May 199856.1AppointedBishop of Dodge City, Kansas, USA
16 Jul 199856.2Ordained BishopBishop of Dodge City, Kansas, USA
15 Dec 201068.6ResignedBishop of Dodge City, Kansas, USA

MicroData Summary for Ronald Michael Gilmore:
Bishop Ronald Michael Gilmore (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Dodge City

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Dodge City.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 15 Dec 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Number 13,357

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013