Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop James Patrick Keleher

Archbishop Emeritus of Kansas City in Kansas


from the Official Web Site of the Archdiocese

from the Official Web Site of the Archdiocese

Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jul 1931 BornChicago, IL
12 Apr 195826.7Ordained PriestPriest of Chicago, Illinois, USA
20 Oct 198453.2AppointedBishop of Belleville, Illinois, USA
11 Dec 198453.4Ordained BishopBishop of Belleville, Illinois, USA
28 Jun 199361.9AppointedArchbishop of Kansas City in Kansas, USA
8 Sep 199362.1InstalledArchbishop of Kansas City in Kansas, USA
15 Jan 200573.5ResignedArchbishop of Kansas City in Kansas, USA

MicroData Summary for James Patrick Keleher:
Archbishop James Patrick Keleher (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Kansas City in Kansas

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Kansas City in Kansas.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 15 Jan 2005
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2011, Page 349
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 13 Jan 2014