Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Thomas Joseph Murphy

Deceased

Archbishop of Seattle, Washington


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Oct 1932BornChicago, IL
12 Apr 195825.5Ordained PriestPriest of Chicago, Illinois, USA
5 Jul 197845.8AppointedBishop of Great Falls, Montana, USA
21 Aug 197845.9Ordained BishopBishop of Great Falls, Montana, USA
26 May 198754.6AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Seattle, Washington, USA
21 Aug 199158.9SucceededArchbishop of Seattle, Washington, USA
26 Jun 199764.7DiedArchbishop of Seattle, Washington, USA

MicroData Summary for Thomas Joseph Murphy:
Archbishop Thomas Joseph Murphy (born , died ) Archbishop of Seattle

  • a priest for 39.2 years
  • a bishop for 18.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013