Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfred Leo Abramowicz

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Chicago, Illinois, USA

Titular Bishop of Pesto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jan 1919Born
1 May 194324.2Ordained PriestPriest of Chicago, Illinois, USA
8 May 196849.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA
8 May 196849.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Pesto
13 Jun 196849.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pesto
24 Jan 199575.9RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA
12 Sep 199980.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA

MicroData Summary for Alfred Leo Abramowicz (VIAF: 315940217)
Bishop Alfred Leo Abramowicz (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Chicago

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChicago, Archdiocese of Chicago, Illinois
Ordained BishopSacred Heart Chapel, Quigley South, Seminary, Chicago, Archdiocese of Chicago, Illinois

  • a priest for 56.3 years
  • a bishop for 31.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 6, Number 290

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 15 May 2019

Quantcast