Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edwin Michael Conway

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Chicago, Illinois

Titular Bishop of Augurus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Mar 1934BornChicago
3 May 196026.1Ordained PriestPriest of Chicago, Illinois, USA
24 Jan 199560.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA
24 Jan 199560.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Augurus
20 Mar 199561.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Augurus
9 Aug 200470.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA

MicroData Summary for Edwin Michael Conway:
Bishop Edwin Michael Conway (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Chicago

  • a priest for 44.2 years
  • a bishop for 9.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Number 12,496
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015