Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father James O’Reilly

Deceased

Priest of Leavenworth, Kansas, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1845¹Born
16 Feb 187429.1Ordained PriestPriest of Kansas, USA
26 Jul 188742.5DiedPriest of Leavenworth, Kansas, USA
9 Aug 188742.6AppointedBishop of Wichita, Kansas, USA

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for James O’Reilly
Father James O’Reilly (born 1845, died ) Priest of Leavenworth

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKillyfana, Ireland

  • a priest for 13.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 598
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1887

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 20 May 2017