Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph Patrick Hurley

Deceased

Bishop of Saint Augustine, Florida, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jan 1894Born
29 May 191925.3Ordained PriestPriest of Cleveland, Ohio, USA
16 Aug 194046.5AppointedBishop of Saint Augustine, Florida, USA
6 Oct 194046.7Ordained BishopBishop of Saint Augustine, Florida, USA
26 Nov 194046.8InstalledBishop of Saint Augustine, Florida, USA
15 Jan 194651.9AppointedOfficial to Yugoslavia
18 Aug 194955.5AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Saint Augustine, Florida, USA
17 Dec 195258.9ResignedOfficial to Yugoslavia
30 Oct 196773.7DiedBishop of Saint Augustine, Florida, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph Patrick Hurley (VIAF: 80483370)
Archbishop Joseph Patrick Hurley (born , died ) Bishop of Saint Augustine

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCleveland, Diocese of Cleveland, Ohio

  • a priest for 48.4 years
  • a bishop for 27.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1940, Number 66
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 160

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast