Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Aloysius Durick

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nashville, Tennessee


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Oct 1914BornDayton, TN
23 May 194025.6Ordained PriestPriest
30 Dec 195440.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mobile-Birmingham, Alabama, USA
30 Dec 195440.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Cerbali
24 Mar 195540.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cerbali
2 Dec 196349.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Nashville, Tennessee, USA
3 Mar 196449.4InstalledCoadjutor Bishop of Nashville, Tennessee, USA
4 Sep 196954.9SucceededBishop of Nashville, Tennessee, USA
2 Apr 197560.5ResignedBishop of Nashville, Tennessee, USA
26 Jun 199479.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Nashville, Tennessee, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph Aloysius Durick:
Bishop Joseph Aloysius Durick (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nashville

  • a priest for 54.1 years
  • a bishop for 39.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1955, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013