Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Monsignor Felix Mariam Boff

Deceased

Priest of Cleveland, Ohio, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jan 1831Born
26 May 185322.3Ordained PriestPriest of Cleveland, Ohio, USA
1874²42.9AppointedAdministrator of Cleveland, Ohio, USA
1876²44.9CeasedAdministrator of Cleveland, Ohio, USA
13 Apr 189160.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Cleveland, Ohio, USA
9 Mar 189261.1CeasedApostolic Administrator of Cleveland, Ohio, USA
May 1908²77.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Cleveland, Ohio, USA
13 Jun 190978.3CeasedApostolic Administrator of Cleveland, Ohio, USA
20 Mar 191281.1DiedPriest of Cleveland, Ohio, USA

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary
Felix Mariam Boff
Monsignor Felix Mariam Boff
(born , died )
Priest of Cleveland

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHaegen, France
Ordained PriestCathedral, Cleveland, Diocese of Cleveland, Ohio
Death PlaceVilla Angela, Ursline, Convent, Nottingham, Diocese of Cleveland, Ohio
Buried Place (Original)Calvary, Cemetery, Cleveland, Diocese of Cleveland, Ohio

  • a priest for 58.8 years

External Link(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.3, 19 May 2025; Data: 24 May 2025