Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Patrick Treacy

Deceased

Bishop of La Crosse, Wisconsin


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jul 1890BornMarlborough, MA
8 Dec 191828.3Ordained PriestPriest of Cleveland, Ohio, USA
21 Aug 194555.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of La Crosse, Wisconsin, USA
21 Aug 194555.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Metelis
2 Oct 194555.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Metelis
25 Aug 194858.0SucceededBishop of La Crosse, Wisconsin, USA
11 Oct 196474.2DiedBishop of La Crosse, Wisconsin, USA

MicroData Summary for John Patrick Treacy
Bishop John Patrick Treacy (born , died ) Bishop of La Crosse

  • a priest for 45.8 years
  • a bishop for 19.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1945, Number 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 5 Jun 2016