Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jerome Joseph Hastrich

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Gallup, New Mexico, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Nov 1914Born
9 Feb 194126.2Ordained PriestPriest of Milwaukee, Wisconsin, USA
22 Dec 194531.1IncardinatedPriest of Madison, Wisconsin, USA
25 Jul 196348.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Madison, Wisconsin, USA
25 Jul 196348.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Gurza
3 Sep 196348.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gurza
25 Aug 196954.7AppointedBishop of Gallup, New Mexico, USA
31 Mar 199075.3RetiredBishop of Gallup, New Mexico, USA
12 May 199580.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Gallup, New Mexico, USA

MicroData Summary for Jerome Joseph Hastrich
Bishop Jerome Joseph Hastrich (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Gallup

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilwaukee, WI

  • a priest for 54.2 years
  • a bishop for 31.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 19 Feb 2018