Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop George Otto Wirz

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Madison, Wisconsin

Titular Bishop of Municipa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jan 1929BornMonroe
31 May 195223.4Ordained PriestPriest of Madison, Wisconsin, USA
10 Dec 197748.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Madison, Wisconsin, USA
10 Dec 197748.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Municipa
9 Mar 197849.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Municipa
10 Feb 200475.1RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Madison, Wisconsin, USA
23 Nov 201081.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Madison, Wisconsin, USA

MicroData Summary for George Otto Wirz:
Bishop George Otto Wirz (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Madison

  • a priest for 58.5 years
  • a bishop for 32.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013