Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Patrick O’Connor

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Madison, Wisconsin


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1886BornMilwaukee
10 Mar 191225.4Ordained PriestPriest of Milwaukee, Wisconsin, USA
27 Dec 194155.2AppointedBishop of Superior, Wisconsin, USA
7 Mar 194255.4Ordained BishopBishop of Superior, Wisconsin, USA
22 Feb 194659.3AppointedBishop of Madison, Wisconsin, USA
18 Feb 196780.3RetiredBishop of Madison, Wisconsin, USA
18 Feb 196780.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Siccesi
31 Dec 197084.2ResignedTitular Bishop of Siccesi
13 Jul 197386.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Madison, Wisconsin, USA

MicroData Summary for William Patrick O’Connor:
Bishop William Patrick O’Connor (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Madison

  • a priest for 61.3 years
  • a bishop for 31.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1942, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013