Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Donald Edmond Pelotte, S.S.S. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Gallup, New Mexico


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Apr 1945BornWaterville
2 Sep 197227.4Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Blessed Sacrament
24 Feb 198640.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Gallup, New Mexico, USA
6 May 198641.1Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Gallup, New Mexico, USA
31 Mar 199045.0SucceededBishop of Gallup, New Mexico, USA
30 Apr 200863.0ResignedBishop of Gallup, New Mexico, USA
7 Jan 201064.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Gallup, New Mexico, USA

MicroData Summary for Donald Edmond Pelotte: VIAF:238985630
Bishop Donald Edmond Pelotte S.S.S. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Gallup

  • a priest for 37.3 years
  • a bishop for 23.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 30 Apr 2008
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013