Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Raphael Hagan

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Cleveland, Ohio, USA

Titular Bishop of Limata


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Feb 1890Born
7 Mar 191424.0Ordained PriestPriest
27 Apr 194656.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cleveland, Ohio, USA
27 Apr 194656.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Limata
28 May 194656.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Limata
28 Sep 194656.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Cleveland, Ohio, USA

MicroData Summary for John Raphael Hagan
Bishop John Raphael Hagan (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Cleveland

EventPlace
Birth PlacePittsburgh, PA

  • a priest for 32.5 years
  • a bishop for .3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1946, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018