Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Edward Louis Heston, C.S.C. †

Deceased

President of the Pontifical Commission for Social Communications

Titular Archbishop of Numida


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Sep 1907Born
22 Dec 193427.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Holy Cross
12 Apr 196961.5AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Religious and Secular Institutes
8 Sep 197163.9AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Commission for Social Communications
6 Jan 197264.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Numida
13 Feb 197264.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Numida
2 May 197365.6DiedPresident of the Pontifical Commission for Social Communications

MicroData Summary for Edward Louis Heston
Archbishop Edward Louis Heston C.S.C. (born , died ) President of Social Communications

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRavenna, OH, USA
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 38.3 years
  • a bishop for 1.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab/sect/x916: Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 61, Page 292
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 17, Number 892

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast