Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anthony Edward Pevec

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Cleveland, Ohio, USA

Titular Bishop of Mercia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Apr 1925Born
29 Apr 195025.0Ordained PriestPriest of Cleveland, Ohio, USA
13 Apr 198256.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cleveland, Ohio, USA
13 Apr 198256.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Mercia
2 Jul 198257.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mercia
3 Apr 200175.9RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Cleveland, Ohio, USA
14 Dec 201489.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Cleveland, Ohio, USA

MicroData Summary for Anthony Edward Pevec
Bishop Anthony Edward Pevec (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Cleveland

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCleveland, Diocese of Cleveland, Ohio
Ordained BishopSt. John Evangelist, Cathedral, Cleveland, Diocese of Cleveland, Ohio

  • a priest for 64.6 years
  • a bishop for 32.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 73, Number 5,872
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 74, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast