Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Neal James Buckon

Auxiliary Bishop of United States of America, Military

Titular Bishop of Vissalsa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Sep 1953 BornColumbus, OH
25 May 199541.7Ordained PriestPriest of Cleveland, Ohio, USA
3 Jan 201157.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of United States of America, Military
3 Jan 201157.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Vissalsa
22 Feb 201157.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vissalsa

MicroData Summary for Neal James Buckon:
Bishop Neal James Buckon (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of United States of America, Military

Please contact the Bishop through the Military Ordinariate of United States of America, Military.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Jan 2011
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,957

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013