Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Joseph Boardman

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Brooklyn, New York, USA

Titular Bishop of Gunela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Nov 1894Born
21 May 192126.5Ordained PriestPriest of Brooklyn, New York, USA
28 Mar 195257.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Brooklyn, New York, USA
28 Mar 195257.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Gunela
11 Jun 195257.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gunela
Oct 1977³82.9RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Brooklyn, New York, USA
17 Jul 197883.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Brooklyn, New York, USA

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John Joseph Boardman
Bishop John Joseph Boardman (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Brooklyn

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrooklyn, Diocese of Brooklyn, New York
Ordained BishopBrooklyn, Diocese of Brooklyn, New York

  • a priest for 57.1 years
  • a bishop for 26.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,952, Number 54
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 1, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast