Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Austin Bernard Vaughan

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of New York, New York

Titular Bishop of Cluain Iraird


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Sep 1927BornNew York
8 Dec 195124.2Ordained PriestPriest of New York, New York, USA
24 May 197749.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of New York, New York, USA
24 May 197749.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Cluain Iraird
29 Jun 197749.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cluain Iraird
25 Jun 200072.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of New York, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for Austin Bernard Vaughan:
Bishop Austin Bernard Vaughan (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of New York

  • a priest for 48.5 years
  • a bishop for 23.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013