Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dominick John Lagonegro

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of New York, New York, USA

Titular Bishop of Modruš


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Mar 1943 Born
31 May 196926.2Ordained PriestPriest of New York, New York, USA
30 Oct 200158.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of New York, New York, USA
30 Oct 200158.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Modruš
12 Dec 200158.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Modruš
2 Jul 201875.3RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of New York, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for Dominick John Lagonegro
Bishop Dominick John Lagonegro (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of New York

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWhite Plains
Ordained BishopSaint Patrick, Cathedral, New York, Archdiocese of New York, New York

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of New York.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 165, Number 14,086
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 222, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 2 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 2 Jul 2018

Quantcast