Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter John Byrne

Auxiliary Bishop of New York, New York, USA

Titular Bishop of Cluain Iraird


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jul 1951 Born
1 Dec 198433.3Ordained PriestPriest of New York, New York, USA
14 Jun 201462.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of New York, New York, USA
14 Jun 201462.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Cluain Iraird
4 Aug 201463.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cluain Iraird

MicroData Summary for Peter John Byrne
Bishop Peter John Byrne (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of New York

EventPlace
Birth PlaceManhattan
Ordained PriestSaint Patrick, Cathedral, New York, Archdiocese of New York, New York
Ordained BishopSaint Patrick, Cathedral, New York, Archdiocese of New York, New York

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of New York.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Jun 2014
  • ob/c12: CB, 14 Jun 2014
  • c34: CB, 17 Jun 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 220, Number 18,261

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast