Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Henry Joseph Mansell

Archbishop Emeritus of Hartford, Connecticut


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Oct 1937 BornNew York
19 Dec 196225.2Ordained PriestPriest of New York, New York, USA
24 Nov 199255.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of New York, New York, USA
24 Nov 199255.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Marazanae
6 Jan 199355.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Marazanae
18 Apr 199557.5AppointedBishop of Buffalo, New York, USA
12 Jun 199557.7InstalledBishop of Buffalo, New York, USA
20 Oct 200366.0AppointedArchbishop of Hartford, Connecticut, USA
18 Dec 200366.2InstalledArchbishop of Hartford, Connecticut, USA
29 Oct 201376.1RetiredArchbishop of Hartford, Connecticut, USA

MicroData Summary for Henry Joseph Mansell:
Archbishop Henry Joseph Mansell (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Hartford

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Hartford.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,941
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • r: Bollettino, 29 Oct 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 15 Feb 2014