Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Timothy Anthony McDonnell

Bishop Emeritus of Springfield in Massachusetts


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Dec 1937 BornNew York
1 Jun 196325.4Ordained PriestPriest of New York, New York, USA
30 Oct 200163.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of New York, New York, USA
30 Oct 200163.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Semina
12 Dec 200163.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Semina
9 Mar 200466.2AppointedBishop of Springfield in Massachusetts, USA
1 Apr 200466.2InstalledBishop of Springfield in Massachusetts, USA
19 Jun 201476.4RetiredBishop of Springfield in Massachusetts, USA

MicroData Summary for Timothy Anthony McDonnell:
Bishop Timothy Anthony McDonnell (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Springfield in Massachusetts

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Springfield in Massachusetts.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 165, Number 14,085
  • r: Bollettino, 19 Jun 2014
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 222, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 1 Jun 2015