Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop David Michael O’Connell, C.M.

Bishop of Trenton, New Jersey


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Apr 1955 BornPhiladelphia, PA
29 May 198227.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
4 Jun 201055.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Trenton, New Jersey, USA
30 Jul 201055.3Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Trenton, New Jersey, USA
1 Dec 201055.6SucceededBishop of Trenton, New Jersey, USA

MicroData Summary for David Michael O’Connell:
Bishop David Michael O’Connell C.M. (born ) Bishop of Trenton

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Trenton.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 4 Jun 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • s: Bollettino, 1 Dec 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 203, Number 16,766

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013