Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Thomas McHugh

Deceased

Bishop of Rockville Centre, New York, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jan 1932Born
25 May 195725.3Ordained PriestPriest of Newark, New Jersey, USA
20 Nov 198755.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Newark, New Jersey, USA
20 Nov 198755.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Morosbisdus
25 Jan 198856.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Morosbisdus
13 May 198957.3AppointedBishop of Camden, New Jersey, USA
20 Jun 198957.4InstalledBishop of Camden, New Jersey, USA
7 Dec 199866.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Rockville Centre, New York, USA
4 Jan 200068.0SucceededBishop of Rockville Centre, New York, USA
10 Dec 200068.9DiedBishop of Rockville Centre, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for James Thomas McHugh
Bishop James Thomas McHugh (born , died ) Bishop of Rockville Centre

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOrange, NJ
Ordained BishopSacred Heart, Cathedral, Newark, Archdiocese of Newark, New Jersey
Death PlaceRockville Centre, Diocese of Rockville Centre, New York
Buried Place (Original)Immaculate Conception, Seminary, Huntington, Diocese of Rockville Centre, New York

  • a priest for 43.5 years
  • a bishop for 12.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 107, Number 9,432
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)
  • loc: CB, 7 Oct 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 9 Oct 2021

Quantcast