Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alphonse John Smith

Deceased

Bishop of Nashville, Tennessee


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Nov 1883BornMadison, IN
18 Apr 190824.4Ordained PriestPriest of Indianapolis, Indiana, USA
23 Dec 192340.1AppointedBishop of Nashville, Tennessee, USA
25 Mar 192440.4Ordained BishopBishop of Nashville, Tennessee, USA
16 Dec 193552.1DiedBishop of Nashville, Tennessee, USA

MicroData Summary for Alphonse John Smith:
Bishop Alphonse John Smith (born , died ) Bishop of Nashville

  • a priest for 27.7 years
  • a bishop for 11.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1924, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013