Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles Garrett Maloney

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Louisville, Kentucky

Titular Bishop of Bardstown


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Sep 1912BornLouisville
8 Dec 193725.2Ordained PriestPriest of Louisville, Kentucky, USA
30 Dec 195442.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Louisville, Kentucky, USA
30 Dec 195442.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Capsa
2 Feb 195542.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Capsa
5 Jan 198875.3RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Louisville, Kentucky, USA
2 Feb 199582.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Bardstown
30 Apr 200693.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Louisville, Kentucky, USA

MicroData Summary for Charles Garrett Maloney:
Bishop Charles Garrett Maloney (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Louisville

  • a priest for 68.4 years
  • a bishop for 51.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1955, Number 8
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013