Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Rumbek

Dioecesis Rumbekensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 12 December 1974
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Juba
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: South Sudan
  • Square Kilometers: 60,000 (23,175 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Rumbek Diocese, c/o Belthany House, P.O. Box 21102, 00505 Nairobi, Kenya
  • Telephone: (020)801.96.53

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Rumbek
3 July 1955ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Bahr el-Gebel
Vicariate Apostolic of Bahr el-Ghazal
Prefecture Apostolic of Mupoi
Vicariate Apostolic of Rumbek (erected)
Diocese of Rumbek
12 December 1974ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Rumbek Diocese of Rumbek
21 March 1986Territory LostDiocese of Rumbek Diocese of Yei (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Rumbek
196811110ap1971
Diocese of Rumbek
1980101,139865,00011.7%911010,1132611ap1981
198834,500526,2266.6%1134,50016ap1991
199948,0001,900,0002.5%323261,846261515ap2000
200054,0002,800,0001.9%427311,741312737ap2001
200159,0002,800,0002.1%427311,903333742ap2002
200265,0003,200,0002.0%427312,096354042ap2003
200376,0003,800,0002.0%527322,375374173ap2004
200489,0003,800,0002.3%528332,696394673ap2005
2010150,0004,444,6053.4%1029393,8464160137ap2011
2012150,0004,697,0003.2%817256,000233524ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 24 Dec 2013