Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre Trần Ðnh Tứ

Bishop Emeritus of Ph Cường, Viet Nam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Mar 1937 Born
29 Apr 196528.1Ordained PriestPriest
5 Nov 199861.6AppointedBishop of Ph Cường, Viet Nam
6 Jan 199961.8Ordained BishopBishop of Ph Cường, Viet Nam
30 Jun 201275.3RetiredBishop of Ph Cường, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Pierre Trần Ðnh Tứ
Bishop Pierre Trần Ðnh Tứ (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Ph Cường

EventPlace
Birth PlaceThi Bnh

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ph Cường.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Number 13,458
  • r: Bollettino, 30 Jun 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.8, 28 Mar 2020; Data: 6 Apr 2020

Quantcast