Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Hanna Shomali

Auxiliary Bishop of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}

Titular Bishop of Lydda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 May 1950 BornBeit-Sahour
5 Sep 197222.3Ordained PriestPriest of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
31 Mar 201059.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
31 Mar 201059.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Lydda
27 May 201060.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lydda

MicroData Summary for William Hanna Shomali:
Bishop William Hanna Shomali (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}

Please contact the Bishop through the Patriarchate of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 31 Mar 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 202, Number 16,646

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013