Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Salim Sayegh

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine

Titular Bishop of Aquae in Proconsulari


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Mar 1935 Born
28 Jun 195924.2Ordained PriestPriest of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
26 Nov 198146.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
26 Nov 198146.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Aquae in Proconsulari
6 Jan 198246.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aquae in Proconsulari
19 Jan 201276.8RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine

MicroData Summary for Salim Sayegh
Bishop Salim Sayegh (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRumaimin

Please contact the Bishop through the Patriarchate of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 19 Jan 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast