Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jerzy Maculewicz, O.F.M. Conv.

Apostolic Administrator of Uzbekistan

Titular Bishop of Nara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 May 1955 BornDaszew, Ukraine
2 Oct 199439.3ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
22 Jun 199641.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
1 Apr 200549.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of Uzbekistan
1 Apr 200549.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Nara
14 May 200550.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nara

MicroData Summary for Jerzy Maculewicz:
Bishop Jerzy Maculewicz O.F.M. Conv. (born ) Apostolic Administrator of Uzbekistan

Please contact the Bishop through the Apostolic Administration of Uzbekistan.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Number 14,889

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013