Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Athanasius Schneider, O.R.C.

Auxiliary Bishop of Maria Santissima in Astana

Titular Bishop of Celerina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Apr 1961 BornTokmak
198220.7ProfessedMember of Order of the Holy Cross
25 Mar 199029.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Holy Cross
8 Apr 200645.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Karaganda, Kazakhstan
8 Apr 200645.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Celerina
2 Jun 200645.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Celerina
5 Feb 201149.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Maria Santissima in Astana, Kazakhstan

MicroData Summary for Athanasius Schneider:
Bishop Athanasius Schneider O.R.C. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Maria Santissima in Astana

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Maria Santissima in Astana.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Apr 2006
  • ob/c2: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 185, Number 15,165
  • ab: Bollettino, 5 Feb 2011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013