Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eusebio Ramos Morales

Bishop of Caguas, Puerto Rico


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Dec 1952 Born
3 Jun 198330.4Ordained PriestPriest of Caguas, Puerto Rico
11 Mar 200855.2AppointedBishop of Fajardo-Humacao, Puerto Rico
31 May 200855.4Ordained BishopBishop of Fajardo-Humacao, Puerto Rico
2 Feb 201764.1AppointedBishop of Caguas, Puerto Rico
26 Feb 201764.1InstalledBishop of Caguas, Puerto Rico

MicroData Summary for Eusebio Ramos Morales
Bishop Eusebio Ramos Morales (born ) Bishop of Caguas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMaunabo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Caguas.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Mar 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Number 15,753
  • ab: Bollettino, 2 Feb 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 23 Apr 2017