Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Sergio Alfredo Gualberti Calandrina

Archbishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Nov 1945 BornClusone, Italy
26 Jun 197125.6Ordained PriestPriest of Bergamo, Italy
6 May 199953.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra, Bolivia
6 May 199953.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Arsacal
22 Jul 199953.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arsacal
28 Sep 201165.9AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra, Bolivia
25 May 201367.5SucceededArchbishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Sergio Alfredo Gualberti Calandrina:
Archbishop Sergio Alfredo Gualberti Calandrina (born ) Archbishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Santa Cruz de la Sierra.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 Sep 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 156, Number 13,590
  • s: Bollettino, 25 May 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 7 Jun 2014