Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop René Leigue Cesari

Auxiliary Bishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra, Bolivia

Titular Bishop of Nepeta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Mar 1967 Born
27 Aug 199932.4Ordained PriestPriest of Santa Cruz de la Sierra, Bolivia
31 Oct 201245.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra, Bolivia
31 Oct 201245.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Nepeta
16 Jan 201345.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nepeta

MicroData Summary for René Leigue Cesari
Bishop René Leigue Cesari (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra

EventPlace
Birth PlaceComunidad Nuevo Horizonte

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Santa Cruz de la Sierra.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 31 Oct 2012
  • ob: CB, 8 Jan 2013
  • c2+: CB, 16 Jan 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 213, Number 17,645
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018