Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Maria Travia

Deceased

Almoner Emeritus of the Office of Papal Charities

Titular Archbishop of Termae Himerae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1914BornPalermo, Italy
11 Jul 193723.5Ordained PriestPriest
16 Dec 196855.0AppointedAlmoner of the Office of Papal Charities
16 Dec 196855.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Termae Himerae
6 Jan 196955.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Termae Himerae
23 Dec 198976.0RetiredAlmoner of the Office of Papal Charities
5 Feb 200692.1DiedAlmoner Emeritus of the Office of Papal Charities

MicroData Summary for Antonio Maria Travia:
Archbishop Antonio Maria Travia (born , died ) Almoner Emeritus of Papal Charities

  • a priest for 68.6 years
  • a bishop for 37.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: L'Osservatore Romano, 15 Feb 2006
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013