Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Abel Costas Montaño

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tarija, Bolivia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 May 1920Born
22 Sep 194525.3Ordained PriestPriest
11 Nov 196848.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cochabamba, Bolivia
11 Nov 196848.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Novi
6 Jan 196948.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Novi
11 Dec 197454.5AppointedBishop of Tarija, Bolivia
20 Oct 199575.4RetiredBishop of Tarija, Bolivia
11 Feb 201594.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Tarija, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Abel Costas Montaño
Bishop Abel Costas Montaño (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tarija

EventPlace
Birth PlacePocona
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 69.3 years
  • a bishop for 46.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 11 Feb 2015
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 7, Number 335

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast