Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop André-Pierre-François Fauvel

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Apr 1902Born
29 Jun 192523.2Ordained PriestPriest
24 Apr 194745.0AppointedBishop of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon), France
3 Jul 194745.2Ordained BishopBishop of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon), France
28 Feb 196865.8ResignedBishop of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon), France
28 Feb 196865.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Abthugni
10 Dec 197068.6ResignedTitular Bishop of Abthugni
21 Jan 198380.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon), France

MicroData Summary for André-Pierre-François Fauvel
Bishop André-Pierre-François Fauvel (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValognes

  • a priest for 57.5 years
  • a bishop for 35.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1947, Number 68

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017