Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Joseph Pays

Deceased

Bishop of Carcassonne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jan 1882BornJulos
9 Jul 190523.5Ordained PriestPriest
16 Aug 193250.6AppointedBishop of Carcassonne, France
7 Oct 193250.8Ordained BishopBishop of Carcassonne, France
18 Jun 195169.4DiedBishop of Carcassonne, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Joseph Pays:
Bishop Jean-Joseph Pays (born , died ) Bishop of Carcassonne

  • a priest for 45.9 years
  • a bishop for 18.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1932, Number 67

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013