Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Felix Lian Khen Thang

Bishop of Kalay, Myanmar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Dec 1959 Born
23 Feb 199030.1Ordained PriestPriest of Mandalay, Myanmar
21 Nov 199232.9IncardinatedPriest of Hakha, Myanmar
3 Mar 200646.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Hakha, Myanmar
3 Mar 200646.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Fesseë
6 May 200646.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Fesseë
22 May 201050.4AppointedBishop of Kalay, Myanmar
29 Jun 201050.5InstalledBishop of Kalay, Myanmar

MicroData Summary for Felix Lian Khen Thang
Bishop Felix Lian Khen Thang (born ) Bishop of Kalay

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGam Ngai

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kalay.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Mar 2006
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 185, Number 15,151
  • ab: Bollettino, 22 May 2010

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018