Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raymond Sumlut Gam

Bishop of Banmaw, Myanmar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jun 1953 Born
29 Mar 198127.7Ordained PriestPriest of Myitkyina, Myanmar
28 Aug 200653.1AppointedBishop of Banmaw, Myanmar
18 Nov 200653.4Ordained BishopBishop of Banmaw, Myanmar

MicroData Summary for Raymond Sumlut Gam
Bishop Raymond Sumlut Gam (born ) Bishop of Banmaw

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSadung

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Banmaw.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Aug 2006
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Number 15,280

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018