Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Abraham Than

Bishop Emeritus of Kengtung


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Sep 1927 BornMong Block
22 Sep 195730.0Ordained PriestPriest
19 Dec 196841.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kengtung, Myanmar
19 Dec 196841.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Tortibulum
11 May 196941.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tortibulum
19 Sep 197245.0AppointedBishop of Kengtung, Myanmar
2 Oct 200174.0ResignedBishop of Kengtung, Myanmar

MicroData Summary for Abraham Than:
Bishop Abraham Than (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Kengtung

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kengtung.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 26 Apr 2014