Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sebastian U Shwe Yauk

Deceased

Bishop of Toungoo, Myanmar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jan 1918Born
22 Dec 194628.9Ordained PriestPriest
21 Mar 196143.1AppointedBishop of Toungoo, Myanmar
21 May 196143.3Ordained BishopBishop of Toungoo, Myanmar
13 Jul 198870.4DiedBishop of Toungoo, Myanmar

MicroData Summary for Sebastian U Shwe Yauk
Bishop Sebastian U Shwe Yauk (born , died ) Bishop of Toungoo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDorokho

  • a priest for 41.5 years
  • a bishop for 27.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast