Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alphonse U Than Aung

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Mandalay

Titular Archbishop of Chusira


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Aug 1933BornChanthaywa
18 Jan 195925.5Ordained PriestPriest of Mandalay, Myanmar
28 Apr 197541.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mandalay, Myanmar
28 Apr 197541.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Horrea
19 Oct 197542.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Horrea
25 Sep 197845.1AppointedArchbishop of Mandalay, Myanmar
3 Apr 200268.7ResignedArchbishop of Mandalay, Myanmar
3 Apr 200268.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Chusira
2 Nov 200471.3DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Mandalay, Myanmar

MicroData Summary for Alphonse U Than Aung:
Archbishop Alphonse U Than Aung (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Mandalay

  • a priest for 45.8 years
  • a bishop for 29.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 3 Apr 2014