Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Marco Tin Win

Archbishop-Elect of Mandalay, Myanmar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Apr 1960 Born
22 Sep 198727.4Ordained PriestPriest of Mandalay, Myanmar
25 Apr 201959.0AppointedArchbishop of Mandalay, Myanmar
23 Jun 201959.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Mandalay, Myanmar

MicroData Summary for Marco Tin Win
Father Marco Tin Win (born ) Archbishop-Elect of Mandalay

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMon Hla, Archdiocese of Mandalay
Ordained BishopSacred Heart, Cathedral, Mandalay, Archdiocese of Mandalay

Please contact the Father through the Archdiocese of Mandalay.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Apr 2019
  • ob: CB, 22 May 2019
  • c2: CB, 24 May 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 26 May 2019

Quantcast