Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Dominique Barbero, P.I.M.E. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Hyderabad, India

Titular Bishop of Doliche


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Nov 1820Born
6 Jun 184625.5Ordained PriestPriest
1853¹32.1ProfessedMember of Pontifical Institute for Foreign Missions
21 Jan 187049.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Hyderabad, India
21 Jan 187049.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Doliche
3 Apr 187049.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Doliche
18 Sep 188160.8DiedVicar Apostolic of Hyderabad, India

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-Dominique Barbero
Bishop Jean-Dominique Barbero P.I.M.E. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Hyderabad

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFoglizzo d'Ivrea, Diocese of Ivrea, Italy
Ordained BishopChiesa Nuova, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 35.2 years
  • a bishop for 11.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Catholic Encyclopedia
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 248
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1870, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Feb 2017